CA SB662 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8023.3 to the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 69957 of, and to add Section 69957.5 to, the Government Code, relating to courts.
Title
Courts: court reporters.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | January 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 853.) (April 24). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E. D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 800.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and B., P. & E. D. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 8023.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 69957 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69957.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |