CA SB662 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 453, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 453, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42023.1 and 48705 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Recycling.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 662 E.Q. Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB662 Committee On E.Q. (Wieckowski) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB662 Committee On E.Q. (Wieckowski) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 453, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2850.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | July 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 928.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 779.) (April 27). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 650.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42023.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 48705 | Amended Code | Citation Text |