CA SB657 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 797, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 797, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50003 and 50201 of the Financial Code, relating to mortgages.
Title
The California Residential Mortgage Lending Act: lenders: licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB657 Berryhill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - SB 657 Berryhill, T. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Senate 2nd Reading SB657 Monning Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - SB 657 Berryhill, T. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Senate 2nd Reading SB657 Monning Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 797, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5427.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5077.) |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Set for hearing August 17. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4954.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5778.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2246.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2216.) (August 27). |
2015-08-21 | Senate | Set for hearing August 27. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | July 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Set for hearing July 6. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1452.) (June 16). |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Set for hearing June 16. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 50003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 50201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1374.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10199.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 712 | New Code | See Bill Text |