CA SB657 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5653.2 to, and to repeal and add Section 5653.1 of, the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Vacuum or suction dredge equipment.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-12 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 620.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-03-25 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-03-14 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-11 | Set for hearing March 22. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. | |
2011-02-19 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 5653.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |