CA SB656 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22760, 22814, 75521, 75523, 75553, 75570, 75571.5, and 75590 of, and to add Sections 75522.5 and 75591.5 to, the Government Code, relating to judges’ retirement, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judges’ Retirement System II: deferred retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB656 Moorlach et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 656 Moorlach Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB656 Moorlach et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-30 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6152.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 7059.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-04-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4114.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-23SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4056.) (January 18).
2018-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2018-01-16SenateJanuary 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-10SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2017-12-21SenateSet for hearing January 8.
2017-04-20SenateApril 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-17SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback