CA SB655 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12965 of, and to add Section 12940.5 to, the Government Code, relating to employment.
Title
Fair Employment and Housing Act: unlawful practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB655 Wright Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 655 Wright Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB655 Wright (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 655 Wright Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB655 Wright (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2013-10-10 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-10 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 2430.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 3225.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2962.) Read third time and amended. (Page 2963.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 13). |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 1198.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 663.) (April 23). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12940.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12965 | Amended Code | Citation Text |