CA SB653 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1911, 1925, 1926, and 1926.05 of, and to add Sections 1911.5 and 1926.01 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Dental hygienists: registered dental hygienist in alternative practice: scope of practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 653 Chang Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB653 Chang (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB653 Chang (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5282.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3167.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3141.) (January 23). |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 770.) (April 22). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1911 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1911.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1925 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1926.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1926.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |