CA SB650 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 493, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 493, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 128734.1 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to skilled nursing facilities.
Title
Skilled nursing facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB650 Stern By Gonzalez Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 650 Stern Senate Third Reading By Muratsuchi (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB650 Stern (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 650 Stern Senate Third Reading By Muratsuchi (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB650 Stern (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 493, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 2550.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 4. Page 2891.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 26). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | July 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1391.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1199.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | May 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 877.) (April 21). |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 128734.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |