CA SB65 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5960.05 of, and to add Section 5960.41 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to behavioral health, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral Health Continuum Infrastructure Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2023-05-18SenateMay 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-04-10SenateApril 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2023-03-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 473.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2023-01-18SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-01-05SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
2023-01-04SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5960.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5960.41New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback