CA SB65 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 23220 and 23221 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: alcohol and marijuana: penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB65 Hill et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1259.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-09SenateMay 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 854.) (April 25).
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-03-21SenateMarch 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
2017-01-04SenateRead first time.
2017-01-03SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 2.
2016-12-29SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code13388Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code13557Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code23136Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code23219New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code23220Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code23221Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback