CA SB65 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 112895 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to olive oil.
Title
Food labeling: olive oil.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 65 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB65 Wolk (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB65 Wolk (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3431.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 953.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 757.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 508.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and HEALTH. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and HEALTH. |
2015-01-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6. |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 79901.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 112895 | Amended Code | Citation Text |