CA SB649 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 65964.2 and 65964.5 to the Government Code, relating to telecommunications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wireless telecommunications facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB649 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 649 Hueso Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB649 Hueso et al (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2017-10-15 Vetoed by the Governor.
2017-09-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
2017-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 2898.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 16. Page 3313.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (September 1).
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-18AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2017-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2017-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28).
2017-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and C. & C.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 1350.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1188.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (April 26).
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-18SenateApril 26 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and GOV. & F.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65850.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65964Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65964.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65964.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback