CA SB647 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 116.780, 116.820, 700.160, 2029.610, and 2029.620 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 14502 of the Corporations Code, to amend Section 915.2 of the Government Code, to amend Section 7100 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 259, 2583, and 8250 of the Probate Code, to amend Section 19280 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 903.47 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Civil law: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Asm. Sam Blakeslee [R] | Sen. Ellen Corbett [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Sen. Tom Harman [R] |
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Senate - Special Consent #9 SB647 Committee on Jud. (Evans) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 647 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB647 Committee on Jud. (Evans) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 647 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB647 Committee on Jud. (Evans) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-06 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2319.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-31 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-08-25 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2598.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-13 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-21 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-06-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and REV. & TAX. | |
2011-05-27 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1141.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-24 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 860.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-21 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 116.780 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 116.820 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 2029.610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 2029.620 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 700.160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 14502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 915.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 7100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2583 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 259 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 8250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 903.47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |