CA SB646 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-13 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-13 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19635 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
State Civil Service Act: adverse action: notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB646 Galgiani (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB646 Galgiani (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 21). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1275.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1188.) (May 25). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 1006.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and APPR. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19635 | Amended Code | Citation Text |