CA SB643 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Set for hearing May 17.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 17 @ 9:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 43871 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fuel cell electric vehicle fueling infrastructure and fuel production: working group: statewide assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 27).
2021-04-16SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2021-04-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-04-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12).
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 12.
2021-03-25SenateReferral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
2021-03-24SenateRe-referred to Coms. on E.Q., TRANS., and E., U. & C.
2021-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code43871New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback