CA SB642 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 342, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 342, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3050.7 and 11713.3 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: manufacturers and distributors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB642 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 642 Padilla Senate Third Reading By DICKINSON (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB642 Padilla (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 642 Padilla Senate Third Reading By DICKINSON (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB642 Padilla (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 342, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2151.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-25 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 2584.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 17). | |
2011-07-13 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 7). | |
2011-06-30 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-28 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-21 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-07 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-05-27 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. | |
2011-05-19 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1035.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 765.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-14 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-02-19 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 11713.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3050.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |