CA SB641 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10703 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB641 Allen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-05-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-13SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1031.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-06SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-06SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 771.) (April 23).
2019-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code10700Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code10703Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback