CA SB641 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1351.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.
Title
Mexican prepaid health plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB641 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB641 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1358.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1188.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 748.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | April 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | March 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., PUB. S., and JUD. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11165.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11165.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1351.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |