CA SB641 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 804, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 804, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1788.61 to the Civil Code, relating to debt buying.
Title
Debt buying: default judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB641 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - SB 641 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB641 Wieckowski (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - SB 641 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB641 Wieckowski (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 804, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2676.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 3029.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 19). |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 14). |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 6). |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1062.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 728.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1788.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |