CA SB640 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1799.111 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 5008 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health services: gravely disabled persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-08 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [01-08-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2020-01-08SenateJanuary 8 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3061.) Reconsideration granted.
2020-01-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-12-20SenateSet for hearing January 8.
2019-04-11SenateApril 10 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
2019-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1799.111Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5008Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback