CA SB637 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to elections.
Title
Elections: candidate qualifications.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2713.) |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Senate rules suspended. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and B. & F.I. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16570 | New Code | See Bill Text |