CA SB637 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 680, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 680, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5653 of the Fish and Game Code, and to add Section 13172.5 to the Water Code, relating to dredging.
Title
Suction dredge mining: permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 5)SB6 37 All en Con (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SB 637 Allen Senate Third Reading By DODD (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Assembly - SB 637 Allen Senate Third Reading By DODD Amend By DODD Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB637 Allen (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SB 637 Allen Senate Third Reading By DODD (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Assembly - SB 637 Allen Senate Third Reading By DODD Amend By DODD Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB637 Allen (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 680, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2776.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 3184.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 9). |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2894.) Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1304.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1157.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 858.) (April 29). |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 593.) (April 14). |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 5653 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13172.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |