CA SB634 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 833, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Section 57114.5 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 21530 and 21531 of the Public Contract Code, to repeal the Castaic Lake Water Agency Law (Chapter 28 of the First Extraordinary Session of the Statutes of 1962), and to create the Santa Clarita Valley Water Agency, and prescribing its boundaries, organization, operation, management, financing, and other powers and duties, relating to water districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Santa Clarita Valley Water Agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB634 Wilk Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 634 Wilk Senate Third Reading By LACKEY (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB634 Wilk (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 833, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
2017-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 2929.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 13. Page 3251.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (July 11).
2017-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W.,P., & W.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1344.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-30SenatePublished May 26 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time and amended.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1188.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 884.) (April 26).
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-17SenateApril 19 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code57114.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code21530Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code21531Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback