CA SB633 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.8 (commencing with Section 12100.70) to Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to electric vehicles.
Title
California Electric Vehicle Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB633 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB633 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1106.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 844.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100.70 | New Code | See Bill Text |