CA SB631 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1255, 1275, 127170, and 128740 of, and to add Section 1253.7 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health care: health facilities: observation and short-stay observation services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1253.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1255 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1275 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 128740 | Amended Code | Citation Text |