CA SB630 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-11 - September 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-11 - September 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 422.56 of the Penal Code, relating to hate crimes.
Title
Crimes: hate crimes.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB630 Skinner (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB630 Skinner (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-11 | Assembly | September 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 13). |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 856.) (April 25). |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25 in PUB. S. pending receipt. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15820.916 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15820.926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15820.936 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15820.946 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1399.826 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 422.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |