CA SB63 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 793, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 793, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53398.52, 53398.62, 53398.69, 53398.80, and 53398.81 of, and to add Section 53398.80.5 to, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 1690 and 1698 of, to add Section 1699 to, and to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 1710) to Part 1 of Division 6 of, the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to seaport infrastructure financing.
Title
Seaport infrastructure financing districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB63 Hall Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 63 Hall Senate Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB63 Hall (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 63 Hall Senate Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB63 Hall (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 793, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. (Corrected September 10). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 2555.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 2. Page 2843.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1147.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 618.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53398.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.80.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53398.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1690 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1698 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1699 | New Code | See Bill Text |