CA SB628 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 243, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 243, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5225 and 72031 of, and to repeal Sections 5224 and 5224.1 of, the Education Code, relating to local educational agencies.
Title
Local educational agencies: governing board elections: Los Angeles Community College District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 628 Lara Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB628 Lara (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB628 Lara (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 243, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 8. Page 2762.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12). |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and E. & R. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 798.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 620.) (April 5). |
2017-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 5224 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 5224.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 5225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 72031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |