CA SB628 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 326, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 326, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4936 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to acupuncture.
Title
Acupuncture: regulation.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Eng [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Sen. Leland Yee [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB628 Yee Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Assembly - SB 628 Yee Senate Third Reading By ENG (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB628 Yee (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Assembly - SB 628 Yee Senate Third Reading By ENG (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB628 Yee (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 326, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-23 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4764.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-22 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 6146.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-08-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-31 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-02-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-07-05 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-20 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1266.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1086.) (May 23). | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 848.) (May 2). | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-04-21 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-20 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-05 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2011-04-04 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-25 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |