CA SB625 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Part 3.5 (commencing with Section 71400) of Division 20 of the Water Code, relating to water, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Central Basin Municipal Water District: receivership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-15 - Assembly - SB 625 Bradford Third Reading Urgency By CARRILLO (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Result (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB625 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2020-06-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 2.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-15AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-06-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 1).
2020-06-01AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2020-05-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2020-05-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2020-05-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2020-05-26AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2019-09-05AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
2019-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (August 21).
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-01AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and TRANS.
2019-05-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 923.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 842.) (April 24).
2019-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 656.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and E., U. & C.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code71400Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback