CA SB625 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10601.2 of, and to add Section 16521.6 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child welfare.
Title
Child welfare: racial and ethnic disparities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10601.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16521.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |