CA SB621 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 515.8 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Overtime compensation: private school teachers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 621 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB621 Bradford (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB621 Bradford (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2475.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 799.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 515.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |