CA SB620 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 682, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 12022.5 and 12022.53 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: crimes: enhancements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB620 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 620 Bradford Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 42 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - SB 620 Bradford Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 31 N: 34 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB620 Bradford (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 682, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2816.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-13SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 33. Page 3206.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-12AssemblyReconsideration granted.
2017-07-10AssemblyMotion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Weber.
2017-07-10AssemblyRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 31. Noes 34. Page 2499.)
2017-06-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 28).
2017-06-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 13).
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-05-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-18SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 1105.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 855.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-05SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code12022.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code12022.53Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback