CA SB619 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 435 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to armories.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Armories: sale.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB619 Hueso et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2019-07-05AssemblyJuly 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-07-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2019-06-13AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1191.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1105.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 872.) (April 24).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 653.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-03SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-28SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-28SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., HOUSING, and JUD.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code435Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback