CA SB616 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 552, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 699.520, 699.540, and 704.070 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 703.520 and 703.550 of, and to add Sections 704.220, 704.225, and 704.230 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enforcement of money judgments: exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB616 Wieckowski et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 616 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Assembly - SB 616 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas Amendment Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB616 Wieckowski et al (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 552, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2843.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 3269.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 16. Page 3076.)
2019-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 21).
2019-08-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03AssemblyJuly 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1364.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-24SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 653.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback