CA SB615 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 859, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 859, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2930 and 2940 of, and to add Section 2931.5 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to the Salton Sea.
Title
Salton Sea restoration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB615 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 615 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB615 Hueso et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 615 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB615 Hueso et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 859, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2844.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 3220.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | June 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 986.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Published May 1 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 708.) (April 17). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2931.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2942.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |