CA SB615 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1720.7 to the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: prevailing wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB615 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 615 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB615 Galgiani (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 615 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB615 Galgiani (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2013-10-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 2424.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 3224.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2962.) Read third time and amended. (Page 2964.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1196.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1017.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 664.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15438.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15459.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1720.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |