CA SB615 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 266, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 266, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 742.40 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Multiple employer welfare arrangements: benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB615 Calderon Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-15 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-09 - Assembly - SB 615 Calderon Senate Third Reading By SOLORIO (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB615 Calderon (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-15 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-09 - Assembly - SB 615 Calderon Senate Third Reading By SOLORIO (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB615 Calderon (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 266, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-21 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4634.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-15 | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4548.) | |
2012-08-14 | Set for hearing August 15. | |
2012-08-13 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4490.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-08-13 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Joint Rule 29.10. | |
2012-08-09 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5847.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 3). | |
2012-06-21 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-06-18 | Re-referred to Coms. on INS. and HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-06-21 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and INS. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1231.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1120.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-25 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 885.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2011-04-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 808.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2011-04-11 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-18 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2011-03-17 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-03-09 | Set for hearing March 23. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on INS. and HEALTH. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1359 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1361.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 1622 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1626 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1631.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1632.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 1749.87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 742.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 742.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |