CA SB614 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44252.6, 44259, and 44468 of, to amend and repeal Section 44283 of, to add Section 44320.3 to, to repeal Section 44268.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 44283.2 to, the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Teacher credentialing: reading instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB614 Rubio (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB614 Rubio (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Assembly | August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 3). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | June 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUM. S. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1105.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 650.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44252.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44259 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44320.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44468 | Amended Code | Citation Text |