CA SB612 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 731, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 731, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1502, 1506, and 1559.110 of, to amend the heading of Article 5.7 (commencing with Section 1559.110) of Chapter 3 of Division 2 of, and to repeal Section 1559.115 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 727.3, 11400, 11402, 11403.2, 11403.3, 16522, 16522.1, and 16522.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care: transitional housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar SB612 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 612 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB612 Mitchell (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 612 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB612 Mitchell (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 731, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2906.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3163.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | June 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1135.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 850.) (April 25). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1559.110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1559.115 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11403.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11403.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16522.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16522.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 727.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |