CA SB61 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 18851, 18852, 18853, and 18855 of, and to amend the heading of Article 14 (commencing with Section 18851) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 18995 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: voluntary contributions: Emergency Food for Families Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB61 Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
2017-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2017-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-04-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-06SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 641.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 584.) (April 3).
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 444.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2017-02-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-01-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-30SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and GOV. & F.
2017-01-04SenateRead first time.
2016-12-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21.
2016-12-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback