CA SB609 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9114, 9115, 9211, 9240, 9266, and 9308 of, and to repeal Section 9309 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: local initiative and referendum measures.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-19-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 0 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - [04-18-2017] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - [04-18-2017] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 744.) Reconsideration granted. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9266 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9308 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9309 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |