CA SB608 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5072 of the Vehicle Code, and to amend Section 18285 of, and to add Section 18286 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to license plate revenue, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Child health and safety: “Have a Heart, Be a Star, Help Our Kids” license plate program.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 689.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 426.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and TRANS. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 5072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18285 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18286 | New Code | See Bill Text |