CA SB608 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 2.2 (commencing with Section 53.8) to Division 1 of, the Civil Code, and to amend Section 647 of the Penal Code, relating to homelessness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homelessness.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2015-12-16SenateJanuary 5 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-12-10SenateSet for hearing January 5.
2015-04-08SenateApril 7 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
2015-03-25SenateSet for hearing April 7.
2015-03-12SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
2015-03-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
2015-02-27SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code53.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code647Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback