CA SB607 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1724, 1753, 1753.55, 1753.6, 1901, 1903, 4928, 4934, 6510, 7137, 7583.22, 7583.23, 7583.24, 7583.27, 7583.29, 7583.47, 8520, 8528, 9810, 9882, and 22259 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 115.5, 7071.6, 7071.8, and 7071.9 of, to add Sections 1636.5, 1636.6, and 5650.5 to, and to repeal Section 1753.4 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 94909 of, and to repeal Sections 94811 and 94904 of, the Education Code, and to amend Section 17973 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to business and professions, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business and professions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB607 Min et al. By Roth Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 607 Min Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB607 Roth (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2021-09-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2592.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2932.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-03AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-03AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-07-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-06-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1325.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1198.) (May 20).
2021-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-17SenateMay 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-04SenateMay 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-27SenateMay 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 841.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-03-11SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code115.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1724Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1753Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1753.55Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1753.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1901Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1903Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22259Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4928Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4934Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6510Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7071.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7071.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7071.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7137Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.22Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.23Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.24Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.27Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.29Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.47Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8520Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8528Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9810Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9882Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code94811Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code94904Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code94909Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17973Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607#92AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607#91AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607#90ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607#89CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB607

Bill Comments

feedback