CA SB607 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 48900 of, and to add Section 48901.1 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil discipline.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil discipline: suspensions and expulsions: willful defiance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 607 Skinner Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB607 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 607 Skinner Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER Amendment Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB607 Skinner et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblyAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes
2018-08-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
2018-08-27AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 6472.)
2018-08-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-07AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2018-08-06AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
2017-09-13AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2017-06-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-26AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 21).
2017-05-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-08SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 985.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-18SenatePublished April 18 at 9 p.m.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 620.) (April 5).
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback