CA SB607 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 108.6 to the Labor Code, relating to certified electricians.
Title
Certified electricians: skilled journeyperson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | April 22 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 729.) Reconsideration granted. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | April 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 108.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |