CA SB607 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 510 of, and to add Section 511.5 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: working hours.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 664.) Reconsideration granted. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 511.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |