CA SB606 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 350, 377, 1058.5, 1120, 10608.12, 10608.20, 10610.2, 10610.4, 10620, 10621, 10630, 10631, 10631.2, 10635, 10640, 10641, 10642, 10644, 10645, 10650, 10651, 10653, 10654, and 10656 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 10612 of, to add Sections 10608.35, 10609.20, 10609.22, 10609.24, 10609.26, 10609.28, 10609.30, 10609.32, 10609.34, 10609.36, 10609.38, 10617.5, 10618, 10630.5, 10632.1, 10632.2, 10632.3, and 10657 to, to repeal Section 10631.7 of, and to repeal and add Section 10632 of, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water management planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB606 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - SB 606 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Assembly - SB 606 Skinner Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E. Amend By GARCIA, E. Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB606 McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - SB 606 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Assembly - SB 606 Skinner Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E. Amend By GARCIA, E. Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB606 McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-05-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5082.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 5167.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3254.) |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on APPR. and RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | (Corrected October 10). |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 17. Page 2690.) |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 18). |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1072.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 944.) (May 3). |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |