CA SB603 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22972, 22973, and 22974.8 of, and to add Sections 22973.3 and 22973.4 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to retail tobacco sales.
Title
Retail cigarette and tobacco sales: licenses: violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Jenny Oropeza [D] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Sen. Gloria Romero [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB603 Padilla (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-07-08 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-07-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-06-18 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2009-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1182.) To Assembly. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1073.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-18 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-01 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 639.) | |
2009-04-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-04-03 | Set for hearing April 22. | |
2009-03-26 | To Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |